KY HB2 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-23 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-23 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Propose to amend Section 181 of the Constitution of Kentucky to authorize the General Assembly to confer upon the proper authority of any city or county the power to levy a local option sales and use tax, subject to specifically enumerated conditions and limitations; submit to the voters for approval or disapproval; supply ballot language.
Title
AN ACT proposing to amend Section 181 of the Constitution of Kentucky relating to local levies of sales and use taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2016-03-22 | Senate | floor amendment (3) filed |
2016-03-17 | Senate | floor amendments (1-title) and (2) filed |
2016-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-11 | House | passed 60-31 |
2016-03-11 | House | floor amendment (3) withdrawn |
2016-03-11 | House | 3rd reading |
2016-03-09 | House | floor amendment (3) filed |
2016-03-08 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed |
2016-03-08 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 9, 2016 |
2016-03-08 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-07 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-03-03 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-10 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2016-02-09 | House | introduced in House |