KY HB2 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - received in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - received in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
(H0366B01) Amend various sections of KRS Chapter 5 to divide the Commonwealth into the following representative districts: DISTRICT 1 - Ballard, Carlisle, Fulton, Hickman, McCracken (part); DISTRICT 2 - Graves, McCracken (part); DISTRICT 3 - McCracken (part); DISTRICT 4 - Caldwell, Crittenden, Livingston, McCracken (part); DISTRICT 5 - Calloway, Trigg (part); DISTRICT 6 - Lyon, Marshall, McCracken (part); DISTRICT 7 - Daviess (part), Henderson (part), Union; DISTRICT 8 - Christian (part), Trigg (part); DISTRICT 9 - Christian (part); DISTRICT 10 - Hopkins (part); DISTRICT 11 - Henderson (part); DISTRICT 12 - Daviess (part), Hopkins (part), McLean, Webster; DISTRICT 13 - Daviess (part); DISTRICT 14 - Daviess (part), Ohio; DISTRICT 15 - Christian (part), Hopkins (part), Muhlenberg; DISTRICT 16 - Logan, Todd; DISTRICT 17 - Butler, Grayson, Hardin (part); DISTRICT 18 - Breckinridge, Bullitt (part), Daviess (part), Hancock, Hardin (part); DISTRICT 19 - Edmonson, Hart, Larue; DISTRICT 20 - Warren (part); DISTRICT 21 - Warren (part); DISTRICT 22 - Allen, Simpson, Warren (part); DISTRICT 23 - Barren, Warren (part); DISTRICT 24 - Casey, Marion, Pulaski (part); DISTRICT 25 - Hardin (part); DISTRICT 26 - Hardin (part); DISTRICT 27 - Bullitt (part), Hardin (part), Meade; DISTRICT 28 - Jefferson County (part); DISTRICT 29 - Jefferson County (part); DISTRICT 30 - Jefferson County (part); DISTRICT 31 - Jefferson County (part); DISTRICT 32 - Jefferson County (part); DISTRICT 33 - Jefferson County (part); DISTRICT 34 - Jefferson County (part); DISTRICT 35 - Jefferson County (part); DISTRICT 36 - Garrard, Madison (part); DISTRICT 37 - Jefferson County (part); DISTRICT 38 - Jefferson County (part); DISTRICT 39 - Fayette (part), Jessamine; DISTRICT 40 - Jefferson County (part); DISTRICT 41 - Jefferson County (part); DISTRICT 42 - Jefferson County (part); DISTRICT 43 - Jefferson County (part); DISTRICT 44 - Jefferson County (part); DISTRICT 45 - Fayette (part); DISTRICT 46 - Jefferson County (part); DISTRICT 47 - Carroll, Henry, Oldham (part), Trimble; DISTRICT 48 - Jefferson County (part); DISTRICT 49 - Bullitt (part); DISTRICT 50 - Bullitt (part), Nelson, Spencer (part); DISTRICT 51 - Adair, Taylor; DISTRICT 52 - McCreary, Pulaski (part), Wayne; DISTRICT 53 - Cumberland, Green, Metcalfe, Monroe; DISTRICT 54 - Boyle, Washington; DISTRICT 55 - Anderson, Mercer, Spencer (part); DISTRICT 56 - Fayette (part), Franklin (part), Woodford; DISTRICT 57 - Franklin (part); DISTRICT 58 - Shelby, Spencer (part); DISTRICT 59 - Jefferson County (part), Oldham (part); DISTRICT 60 - Boone (part); DISTRICT 61 - Gallatin, Grant, Owen; DISTRICT 62 - Fayette (part), Scott; DISTRICT 63 - Kenton (part); DISTRICT 64 - Kenton (part); DISTRICT 65 - Kenton (part); DISTRICT 66 - Boone (part); DISTRICT 67 - Campbell (part); DISTRICT 68 - Campbell (part); DISTRICT 69 - Boone (part), Campbell (part), Kenton (part); DISTRICT 70 - Bracken, Fleming, Mason; DISTRICT 71 - Menifee, Morgan, Rowan (part), Wolfe (part); DISTRICT 72 - Bath, Bourbon, Fayette (part), Nicholas; DISTRICT 73 - Clark, Madison (part); DISTRICT 74 - Montgomery, Powell, Wolfe (part); DISTRICT 75 - Fayette (part); DISTRICT 76 - Fayette (part); DISTRICT 77 - Fayette (part); DISTRICT 78 - Campbell (part), Harrison, Pendleton, Robertson; DISTRICT 79 - Fayette (part); DISTRICT 80 - Lincoln, Pulaski (part), Rockcastle; DISTRICT 81 - Madison (part); DISTRICT 82 - Laurel (part), Whitley; DISTRICT 83 - Clinton, Pulaski (part), Russell; DISTRICT 84 - Harlan (part), Perry; DISTRICT 85 - Laurel (part), Pulaski (part); DISTRICT 86 - Knox, Laurel (part); DISTRICT 87 - Bell, Harlan (part); DISTRICT 88 - Fayette (part); DISTRICT 89 - Jackson, Laurel (part), Owsley; DISTRICT 90 - Clay, Harlan (part), Leslie; DISTRICT 91 - Breathitt, Estill, Lee; DISTRICT 92 - Knott, Letcher (part), Magoffin; DISTRICT 93 - Pike (part); DISTRICT 94 - Harlan (part), Letcher (part), Pike (part); DISTRICT 95 - Floyd (part); DISTRICT 96 - Carter, Lewis; DISTRICT 97 - Floyd (part), Johnson, Martin, Pike (part); DISTRICT 98 - Boyd (part), Greenup;DISTRICT 99 - Boyd (part), Elliott, Lawrence, Rowan (part); DISTRICT 100 - Boyd (part); PLAN INTEGRITY VERIFIED; specify that precinct names may be shortened to accommodate formatting requirements of the bill drafting system and that the precinct names will be provided in full in codification; specify how county and precinct names are to be displayed depending on whether the territory of the county or precinct is included in a particular legislative district in its entirety or in part and direct how those items will be displayed in codification; direct county boards of elections to change precinct boundaries to conform to representative district boundaries.
Title
AN ACT relating to redistricting.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Stumbo [D] | Rep. Larry Clark [D] | Rep. Rocky Adkins [D] | Rep. Sannie Overly [D] |
Rep. Thomas Thompson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-03-06 | House | passed 53-46 with Committee Substitute |
2013-03-06 | House | floor amendments (1) (2) (3) and (4) defeated |
2013-03-06 | House | 3rd reading |
2013-03-06 | House | floor amendment (5) filed to Committee Substitute |
2013-03-06 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 6, 2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | taken from Rules |
2013-03-05 | House | floor amendments (1) (2) (3) and (4) filed to Committee Substitute |
2013-03-05 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2013-02-26 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-25 | House | returned to State Government (H) |
2013-02-25 | House | 2nd reading |
2013-02-25 | House | taken from State Government (H) |
2013-02-22 | House | posting waived |
2013-02-22 | House | returned to State Government (H) |
2013-02-22 | House | 1st reading |
2013-02-22 | House | taken from State Government (H) |
2013-02-20 | House | to State Government (H) |
2013-02-19 | House | introduced in House |