KY HB195 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-28 - to Agriculture (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-28 - to Agriculture (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 42.4592 to delete transfers to the secondary wood products development fund; amend KRS 1154.20-170 to make an internal reference correction; amend KRS 154.47-005 to define "cabinet" as the Economic Development Cabinet and strike references to the Kentucky Wood Products Competitiveness Corporation and its board; amend KRS 154.47-040 to delete all references to the Kentucky Wood Products Competitiveness Corporation and require information regarding secondary wood products for state capital construction be maintained by the Cabinet for Finance and Administration; delete requirement that the board review any capital construction applications for secondary wood products; amend KRS 154.47-050 and 154.47-055 to delete references to the Kentucky Wood Products Competitiveness Corporation developing a workforce training curricula and place that function in the Department of Workforce Investment in the Education and Workforce Development Cabinet; amend KRS 154.47-060 to make permissive the University of Kentucky's contracting for use of the Quicksand Wood Utilization Center as a secondary wood products training center; delete contracting for the center by the Kentucky Wood Products Competitiveness Corporation; amend KRS 154.47-065 to permit the cabinet to work with the Division of Forestry to establish benchmarks for Kentucky forest industries; amend KRS 154.47-075 to delete the board from the implementation of a program of training assistance; repeal KRS 42.4586, 154.47-015, 154.47-020, 154.47-025, 154.47-030, 154.47-035, 154.47-045, and 154.47-070; and abolish the Kentucky Wood Products Competitiveness Corporation and transfer all records, documents, assets and liabilities to the Cabinet for Economic Development.
Title
AN ACT relating to the abolishment of the Kentucky Wood Products Competitiveness Corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-28 | to Agriculture (S) | |
2011-02-24 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-23 | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 | |
2011-02-22 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 23, 2011 | |
2011-02-18 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-17 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-15 | posted in committee | |
2011-01-07 | to Economic Development (H) | |
2011-01-06 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB195.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB195/bill.doc |