KY HB193 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 139.480 to exempt from sales and use tax tangible personal property purchased by a person for incorporation into a structure or improvement to real property under a contract with the federal, state, or local government, or a resident, nonprofit educational, charitable, or religious institution; apply to sales made after October 1, 2020, but before October 1, 2024; require the Department of Revenue to report the claimed exemptions to the Interim Joint Committee on Appropriations and Revenue; amend KRS 131.190 to give the Department authority to provide the report to LRC.
Title
AN ACT relating to sales and use tax exemptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |