KY HB192 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-6)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 141.010 to exclude United States military retirees' pension income from income taxation for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2019, and ending before January 1, 2023; require reporting by the Department of Revenue; amend various sections of KRS Chapters 131 and 141 to make technical corrections.
Title
AN ACT relating to an exemption of income taxation for military pensions.
Sponsors
Rep. Walker Thomas [R] | Rep. DJ Johnson [R] | Rep. John Blanton [R] | Rep. Larry Brown [R] |
Rep. John Carney [R] | Sen. Matt Castlen [R] | Rep. Will Coursey [D] | Rep. Myron Dossett [R] |
Rep. Chris Fugate [R] | Rep. Alan Gentry [D] | Rep. Jeff Greer [D] | Rep. David Hale [R] |
Rep. Mark Hart [R] | Rep. Richard Heath [R] | Rep. Gary Herald [R] | Rep. Kenny Imes [R] |
Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. Stan Lee [R] | Rep. Donna Mayfield [R] | Rep. Chad McCoy [R] |
Rep. Michael Meredith [R] | Rep. Tim Moore [R] | Rep. Kimberly Moser [R] | Rep. Phillip Pratt [R] |
Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] | Rep. Brandon Reed [R] | Rep. Jody Richards [D] | Rep. Rob Rothenburger [R] |
Rep. Sal Santoro [R] | Rep. Dean Schamore [D] | Rep. Russell Webber [R] | Rep. Susan Westrom [D] |
Rep. Jill York [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-02-01 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-01-31 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-01-29 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-19 | House | reassigned to Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-01-11 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB192.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB192/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/18RS/HB192/FN.pdf |