KY HB191 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-13)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 44)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 367.680 to define terms; amend KRS 367.681 to add requirements for prescriptions for visual aid glasses; amend KRS 367.683 and 367.684 to make applicable to all contact lens and visual aid glasses sellers and dispensers; amend KRS 367.685 to require fitting based on ocular health; amend KRS 367.686 and 367.687 to make applicable to visual aid glasses; create a new section of KRS 367.680 to 367.690 to set requirements for performance and operation of assessment mechanisms for contact lenses and visual aid glasses; amend KRS 367.688 and 367.690 to make applicable to visual aid glasses; increase the fine for violations to $11,000; create a new section of KRS 367.680 to 367.690 to provide that those sections may be cited as the Consumer Protection in Eye Care Act; APPROPRIATION.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to consumer protection in eye care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 347 (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SC S 1, SFA 1 RSN# 534 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 125 (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: Table RCS# 124 (Y: 11 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-02-13 - House - House: Consider Motion HFA 4 RCS# 123 (Y: 13 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2018-02-13 - House - House: Consider Motion HFA 1 RCS# 122 (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 44)
2018-03-20Housedelivered to Governor
2018-03-20Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-03-20Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-03-19Housepassed 88-0
2018-03-19HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute & floor amendment (1)
2018-03-16Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute & floor amendment (1)
2018-03-15Houseto Rules (H)
2018-03-15Housereceived in House
2018-03-14Senatepassed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) & floor amendment (1)
2018-03-14Senatefloor amendments (2) (3) (4) and (5) withdrawn
2018-03-14Senate3rd reading
2018-03-13Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 14, 2018
2018-03-09Senatefloor amendment (5) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-03-08Senatefloor amendments (2) and (3) filed to Bill, (4) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-03-08Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-07Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-03-07Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-02-15Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2018-02-14Senatereceived in Senate
2018-02-13Housepassed 90-7 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title), and floor amendment (1)
2018-02-13Housefloor amendment (4) defeated
2018-02-13House3rd reading
2018-02-09Housefloor amendment (4) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (5) filed
2018-02-09Housefloor amendments (2) and (3) withdrawn
2018-02-08Housefloor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (3) filed to Bill
2018-02-08Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 9, 2018
2018-02-02House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-01Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2018-01-30Houseposted in committee
2018-01-23Houseposted in committee
2018-01-17Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2018-01-11Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB191.htm
Texthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB191/bill.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB191/HCS1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB191/HCA1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB191/HFA1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB191/HFA2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB191/HFA3.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB191/HFA4.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB191/HFA5.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB191/SCS1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB191/SFA1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB191/SFA2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB191/SFA3.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB191/SFA4.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB191/SFA5.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB191/vote_history.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback