KY HB191 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 34)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 34)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 329A.070 to exempt certain individuals employed by an insurance company from the Kentucky Private Investigators Licensing Act; amend KRS 304.9-430 to exempt individuals employed by an insurance company to investigate fraudulent claims from licensure requirements of a staff adjuster, and delete an expired subsection; amend KRS 304.20-020 to provide that any insured named in the policy, rather than the named insured, may reject uninsured motor vehicle coverage and provide that if a named insured rejected coverage, in addition to coverage provided in or supplemental to renewal, the insurer is not required to provide coverage supplemental to a reinstatement, substitute, replacement, or amended policy issued to the same named insured by the same insurer or its affiliates; amend KRS 304.39-230 to specify the method for determining the date for when the last reparation payment is made; amend KRS 304.9-295 and 304.9-436 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 34) |
2017-03-08 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-08 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-07 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-06 | House | received in House |
2017-03-06 | Senate | passed 29-7 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed |
2017-03-03 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2017-03-03 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 3, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-28 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-21 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-16 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2017-02-14 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2017-02-13 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 16, 2017 |
2017-02-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-09 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-09 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2017-02-07 | House | introduced in House |