KY HB187 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 88)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 88)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to define "dyslexia" and "qualified dyslexia screening tool"; require the Department of Education to make available a dyslexia toolkit that includes guidance on the instruction of students displaying characteristics of dyslexia; require the Department of Education to collaborate with the Kentucky Collaborative Center for Literacy Development to update professional development for teachers related to dyslexia; require each local board of education to develop policies for identifying and assisting students in kindergarten through grade three with dyslexia and other learning disabilities; require school districts to report data to the Department of Education regarding dyslexia screening and results; require teacher preparation programs to include instruction on dyslexia; require the commissioner of education to select three school districts to serve as dynamic laboratories of learning. Amend KRS 158.305 to revise the definition of "dyslexia"; require local boards of education to develop policies related to the implementation of response-to-intervention; require the Department of Education, in collaboration with the Kentucky Center for Education and Workforce Statistics, to report to the Interim Joint Committees on Education and Health and Welfare by November 30 of each year regarding school districts' implementation of response-to-intervention.
Title
AN ACT relating to dyslexia.
Sponsors
Rep. Addia Wuchner [R] | Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] | Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. John Blanton [R] |
Rep. Derrick Graham [D] | Rep. Mark Hart [R] | Rep. John Sims [D] | Rep. William Wells [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 628 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 406 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 281 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 406 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 281 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 88) |
2018-03-27 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-22 | House | passed 87-0 |
2018-03-22 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute |
2018-03-22 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute |
2018-03-22 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2018-03-22 | House | to Rules (H) |
2018-03-22 | House | received in House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 22, 2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-20 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2018-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | 3rd reading, passed 89-0 with Committee Substitute & committee amendment (1-title) |
2018-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | House | to Rules (H) |
2018-03-08 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-02-22 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2018-02-15 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-17 | House | to Education (H) |
2018-01-11 | House | introduced in House |