KY HB185 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 186A.520 to provide process for insurance companies to obtain salvage titles; amend KRS 376.275 to allow for the disposal of voluntarily towed abandoned vehicles.
Title
AN ACT relating to motor vehicle titles.
Sponsors
Rep. Brent Yonts [D] | Rep. David Hale [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2016-03-24 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-23 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-03-16 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2016-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-09 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 11, 2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-03 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-11 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2016-01-07 | House | introduced in House |