KY HB184 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 95A.520 and 95A.540, relating to volunteer fire department mergers, to make it applicable to volunteer fire departments merging prior to the effective date of the Act; create a new section of KRS Chapter 95A to provide that for volunteer fire departments merging after the effective date of the Act, the Fire Commission shall pay to the departments the number of qualified shares of volunteer fire department aid each is entitled to for a period of 20 years after the date of the merger, upon the expiration of which the merged department shall receive only one share; provide contingency protocols if the merged fire department becomes unqualified; amend KRS 95A.540 to apply contingency protocols of new volunteer fire department for fire departments merging prior to the effective date of the act; create a new section of KRS Chapter 95A to provide a contingency protocol if a new volunteer fire department is created out of the merged one during the 20 year period; amend KRS 95A.262 to increase the volunteer fire department aid to $15,000 annually from $11,000 annually.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to fire protection and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 238 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2020-03-17Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-12House3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-09Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2020
2020-03-05House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-04Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-01-15Houseposted in committee
2020-01-09Houseto Local Government (H)
2020-01-07Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback