KY HB183 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-22 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-22 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 158.100 to permit local boards of education to enroll refugees and legal aliens in four year high school programs even if their age will exceed 21 upon graduation; amend KRS 157.360 to adjust SEEK base funding for students refugees or legal aliens over 21 years of age who complete their 4 year high school program.
Title
AN ACT relating to late enrollment in high school.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim DeCesare [R] | Rep. Martha King [D] | Rep. Jody Richards [D] | Rep. Steven Riggs [D] |
Rep. Brent Yonts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2012-03-20 | received in Senate | |
2012-03-19 | 3rd reading, passed 84-8 | |
2012-03-15 | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2012-03-14 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 16, 2012 | |
2012-03-13 | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill | |
2012-03-09 | posted in committee | |
2012-02-09 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2012-02-08 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-07 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2012-02-02 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-04 | to Education (H) | |
2012-01-03 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB183.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB183/bill.doc |