KY HB183 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]

Summary

Reclassify Wurtland in Greenup County, population 1,063, from a city of the sixth class to a city of the fifth class.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT changing the classification of the City of Wurtland, in Greenup County.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-16 signed by Governor
2011-03-04 delivered to Governor
2011-03-04 enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
2011-03-04 passed 91-4
2011-03-04 House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title)
2011-03-04 posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title)
2011-03-03 received in House
2011-03-03 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title)
2011-03-03 posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 3, 2011
2011-03-02 reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) as a Consent Bill
2011-03-01 returned to State & Local Government (S)
2011-03-01 2nd reading
2011-03-01 taken from State & Local Government (S)
2011-02-28 returned to State & Local Government (S)
2011-02-28 1st reading
2011-02-28 taken from State & Local Government (S)
2011-02-23 to State & Local Government (S)
2011-02-18 received in Senate
2011-02-18 3rd reading, passed 96-0
2011-02-17 posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 18, 2011
2011-02-17 2nd reading, to Rules
2011-02-16 reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2011-02-04 posted in committee
2011-01-06 to Local Government (H)
2011-01-05 introduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback