KY HB175 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - to Licensing & Occupations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing and Occupations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 237 to define terms; establish an unlawful discriminatory practice against the firearms industry; create a civil cause of action to be brought by victims; create a civil cause of action to be brought by the Attorney General.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to unlawful discriminatory practices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 194 (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11Senateto Licensing & Occupations (S)
2021-03-04Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-03-04Senatereceived in Senate
2021-03-03House3rd reading, passed 73-24 with floor amendment (2)
2021-03-02Housefloor amendment (1) withdrawn
2021-03-02Housefloor amendment (2) filed
2021-03-01Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2021-02-25Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 26, 2021
2021-02-25House2nd reading, to Rules
2021-02-24Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2021-02-23Houseposted in committee
2021-02-22Houseto Judiciary (H)
2021-01-06Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-01-06Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback