KY HB170 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 137)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 137)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 160.613 to clarify that if a manufacturer, processor, miner, or refiner chooses to claim that a portion of the energy or energy producing fuels purchased by that entity is exempt from the utility gross receipts license tax, the entity claiming the exemption becomes responsible to report and pay the portion of the tax due directly to the Department of Revenue; amend KRS 160.6156 to specify who may request a refund or credit of any overpayment of the tax and require that an appeal of the denial of a requested refund to the Circuit Court shall be made within 30 days from the mailing date of the denial.
Title
AN ACT relating to the utility gross receipts license tax for schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 137) |
2014-04-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2014-04-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2014-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2014-04-14 | House | passed 58-36 |
2014-04-14 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-04-14 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-04-14 | House | to Rules (H) |
2014-04-14 | House | received in House |
2014-04-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, April 14, 2014 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) as a Consent Bill |
2014-04-14 | Senate | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | taken from Rules (S) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-02-14 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-02-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 70-27 |
2014-02-07 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2014-02-05 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 7, 2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-04 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-01-31 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-09 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | introduced in House |