KY HB166 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-15 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-15 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 148.830 to 148.840 to require any contract for the provision and sale of food services and agricultural products in state resort park restaurants, gift shops, concessions, and golf courses to promote the sale of Kentucky-grown agricultural products under the Kentucky Proud Program in accordance with KRS 45A.645, 148.830, 148.835, and 260.017; amend KRS 148.830 to establish promotion program in the Department of Parks to promote the sale of Kentucky-grown agricultural products in state resort park restaurants, gift shops, concessions, and golf courses, in conjunction with the Kentucky Proud Program; require the commissioner of the Department of Parks to promulgate administrative regulations to implement the program; amend KRS 148.835 to establish a promotion program within the Department of Parks that requires the Department of Parks to purchase Kentucky farm-raised catfish and horticultural products if the purchasing officer determines such products are available, can be priced to encourage their sale, and meet the quality standards of the Department of Parks; require the commissioner of the Department of Parks to promulgate administrative regulations to implement the program; amend KRS 148.840 to require the Department of Parks to establish a steering committee to plan and assist in the implementation of the promotion program identified in KRS 148.830 and 148.835 and, upon implementation of the promotion program, require the steering committee to evaluate the promotion program and submit an initial report to the Governor, the secretary of the Finance and Administration Cabinet, and the Legislative Research Commission no later than July 1, 2012, and subsequent annual reports no later than July 1 of each year thereafter; require that the steering committee meet at least once each year at a date and location to be determined by its members to ensure the continuation of the promotion program.
Title
AN ACT relating to the use of Kentucky-grown agricultural products in state resort parks.
Sponsors
Rep. Royce Adams [D] | Rep. Will Coursey [D] | Rep. Mitchel Denham [D] | Rep. Jeff Greer [D] |
Rep. Thomas McKee [D] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] | Rep. Rita Smart [D] |
Rep. Wilson Stone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | signed by Governor | |
2011-03-03 | delivered to Governor | |
2011-03-03 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2011-03-02 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-01 | received in House | |
2011-03-01 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 | |
2011-03-01 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 1, 2011 | |
2011-02-25 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-24 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-09 | to Agriculture (S) | |
2011-02-07 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-04 | 3rd reading, passed 92-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-03 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 4, 2011 | |
2011-02-03 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-02 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-01 | posting waived | |
2011-01-05 | to Agriculture & Small Business (H) | |
2011-01-04 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB166.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB166/bill.doc |