KY HB164 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 387 to enact the Uniform Adult Guardianship and Protective Proceedings Jurisdiction Act, as recommended to the states by the National Conference of Commissioners on Uniform State laws, to govern jurisdictional questions and disputes between states in regard to cases concerning guardians and conservators; amend KRS 387.520 to conform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the Uniform Adult Guardianship and Protective Proceedings Jurisdiction Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-16 signed by Governor
2011-03-04 delivered to Governor
2011-03-04 enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
2011-03-04 received in House
2011-03-04 3rd reading, passed 36-1
2011-03-03 posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 4, 2011
2011-03-03 reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill
2011-03-01 returned to Judiciary (S)
2011-03-01 2nd reading
2011-03-01 taken from Judiciary (S)
2011-02-25 returned to Judiciary (S)
2011-02-25 1st reading
2011-02-25 taken from Judiciary (S)
2011-02-15 to Judiciary (S)
2011-02-11 received in Senate
2011-02-11 3rd reading, passed 95-0
2011-02-10 posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 11, 2011
2011-02-10 2nd reading, to Rules
2011-02-09 reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2011-02-07 posted in committee
2011-01-05 to Judiciary (H)
2011-01-04 introduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback