KY HB163 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 103)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 103)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 61.637 to provide that effective July 1, 2015, local school districts shall not be required to reimburse Kentucky Retirement Systems for retiree health care premiums for reemployed retirees who work less than 80 days a year.
Title
AN ACT relating to reemployment after retirement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 103) |
2015-03-24 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-24 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-24 | House | received in House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2015 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-03-04 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-03 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-2 |
2015-03-02 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 3, 2015 |
2015-03-02 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 3, 2015 |
2015-03-02 | House | taken from Rules |
2015-03-02 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-24 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-03 | House | to Education (H) |
2015-01-09 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB163.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB163/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB163/vote_history.pdf |