KY HB162 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 99)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 99)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 525.080 to include electronic communications within the definition of harassing communications.
Title
AN ACT relating to harassing communications.
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Koenig [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 99) |
2016-04-01 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-04-01 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-04-01 | House | received in House |
2016-04-01 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2016-04-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, April 1, 2016 (Consent Orders #2) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-28 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-03-23 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2016-03-21 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-18 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2016-03-17 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2016 |
2016-03-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-16 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-03-14 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-06 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2016-01-05 | House | introduced in House |