KY HB161 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 514.030 to raise the threshold level of property value for a Class D felony for theft by unlawful taking or disposition from $500 to $1,500.
Title
AN ACT relating to theft.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Massey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | posting withdrawn |
2020-01-10 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-07 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-12-11 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |