KY HB16 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS 309.080 to 309.089 to establish the requirements for an applicant for registration as an alcohol and drug peer support specialist; mandate that an alcohol and drug peer support specialist complete 500 hours of board-approved experience with 25 hours under the direct supervision of a certified or licensed clinical alcohol and drug counselor with at least two years of post-certification or post-licensure experience; require an alcohol and drug peer support specialist to pass an examination approved by the board; mandate completion of three hours of domestic violence training, specify other hours of training required, and obligate applicant to live or work at least a majority of the time in Kentucky; mandate that a registered alcohol and drug peer support specialist comply with the requirements for the training program in suicide assessment, treatment, and management; establish requirements for an applicant for licensure as a licensed clinical alcohol and drug counselor with a 60 hour master's degree, or a doctoral degree, including completion of 2,000 hours of board-approved experience, 300 hours of which is under direct supervision of a licensed clinical alcohol and drug counselor; require a licensed clinical alcohol and drug counselor to pass a written examination approved by the International Certification Reciprocity Consortium on Alcoholism and Drug Abuse; include requirement for three hours of domestic violence training and for an applicant to live or work at least a majority of the time in Kentucky; mandate that a licensed clinical alcohol and drug counselor comply with the requirements for the training program in suicide assessment, treatment, and management; direct the board to promulgate administrative regulations to define the registration process for applicants and for supervisors of record; establish supervision required for a practicing registered alcohol and drug peer support specialist; establish reciprocity; set up revolving fund; amend KRS 309.080 to define "licensed clinical alcohol and drug counselor," "licensee," "practice of alcohol and drug counseling," "registered alcohol and drug peer support specialist," and "registrant"; amend KRS 309.0813 to conform and to delete the requirement for the board to establish an examination committee to administer and evaluate the case method presentation and oral examination; add the requirement for the board to collect and deposit all fees, fines, and other moneys owed to the board into the State Treasury to the credit of a revolving fund; amend KRS 309.083 to change the requirements of supervision for a certified alcohol and drug counselor applicant, permitting supervision from a certified alcohol and drug counselor or licensed clinical alcohol and drug counselor with at least two years of post-certification or post-licensure experience; delete the requirement for a certified alcohol and drug counselor to pass an oral examination approved by the board; mandate three hours of domestic violence training for a certified alcohol and drug counselor; require a certified alcohol and drug counselor applicant to live or work at least a majority of the time in Kentucky; mandate that a certified alcohol and drug counselor comply with the requirements for the training program in suicide assessment, treatment, and management; amend KRS 309.084 to grant, upon application within 90 days from the effective date of this Act, licensure as a licensed clinical alcohol and drug counselor for a certified alcohol and drug counselor with a master's degree or a doctoral degree meeting all requirements for the clinical designation except for the 60-hour requirement for the master's degree and the examination; amend KRS 194A.540, 210.366, 222.005, 309.0805, 309.081, 309.085, 309.086, 309.087, and 309.089 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to alcohol and drug counseling.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-10 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-8 with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 10, 2014 |
2014-03-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-05 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-02-27 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-07 | House | to Licensing & Occupations (H) |
2014-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2014-10-02 | House | To: Interim Joint Committee on Licensing and Occupations |