KY HB158 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 033)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 199 to require national and state background checks of staff members of child-caring facilities and child-placing agencies in Kentucky as newly required by federal law; amend KRS 199.011 to update the definition of "voluntary and informed consent" as it relates to adoption; amend KRS 199.505 to establish a beginning timeframe related to searches of the Kentucky putative father registry that corresponds to the date on which the statute became effective following its enactment in 2018; create a new section of KRS Chapter 620 to establish a foster child bill of rights; amend KRS 620.020 to establish definitions for "position of authority" and "position of special trust"; amend KRS 620.030, relating to reports of abuse or neglect of a child that may or may not involve fictive kin, persons in a position of authority, or persons in a position of special trust; amend KRS 620.040, relating to reports of abuse or neglect of a child that may or may not involve fictive kin, persons in a position of authority, or persons in a position of special trust; amend KRS 620.180 to require case reviews for court approval 60 days after a child has been placed in a qualified residential facility to ensure the Commonwealth is in compliance with federal law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to child welfare and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 249 (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, sfa 1, sfa 2 RSN# 923 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 73 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 033)
2019-03-07Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-07Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-07Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-06Housepassed 94-1
2019-03-06HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendments (1) and (2)
2019-03-06Houseposted for concurrence
2019-03-06Houseto Rules (H)
2019-03-06Housereceived in House
2019-03-06Senate3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendments (1) and (2)
2019-03-06Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 6, 2019
2019-03-01Senatefloor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2019-02-28Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2019-02-28Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-27Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-25Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2019-02-21Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-20House3rd reading, passed 99-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2019-02-20Housetaken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
2019-02-15Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 19, 2019
2019-02-15House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-14Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2019-02-12Houseposted in committee
2019-02-05Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2019-01-11Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback