KY HB156 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-6)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 164)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-6)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 164)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 148 to promote outdoor recreation and tourism development by establishing the Kentucky Mountain Regional Recreation Authority; amend KRS 147A.090 to provide that area development district boards of directors have the power and duty to cooperate with the KMRRA; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to promoting outdoor recreation and tourism development by establishing the Kentucky Mountain Regional Recreation Authority and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Fugate [R] | Rep. Larry Brown [R] | Rep. Danny Bentley [R] | Rep. John Blanton [R] |
Rep. Jim Gooch [R] | Rep. Jeff Greer [D] | Rep. David Hale [R] | Rep. Chris Harris [D] |
Rep. Angie Hatton [D] | Rep. Gary Herald [R] | Rep. Kenny Imes [R] | Rep. Dan Johnson [R] |
Rep. Kim King [R] | Sen. Robert Mills [R] | Rep. Kimberly Moser [R] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] |
Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] | Rep. Sal Santoro [R] | Rep. John Sims [D] | Rep. Jim Stewart [R] |
Rep. Ken Upchurch [R] | Rep. Susan Westrom [D] | Rep. Jill York [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 164) |
2017-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-30 | House | Bill passed 77-7 |
2017-03-30 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2017-03-30 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate committee amendment (1-title) and Committee Substitute |
2017-03-29 | House | to Rules (H) |
2017-03-29 | House | received in House |
2017-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-1 with committee amendment (1-title) and Committee Substitute |
2017-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with committee amendment (1-title) and Committee Substitute as a consent bill |
2017-03-14 | Senate | recommitted to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | taken from Rules |
2017-03-08 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2017-03-03 | Senate | returned to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2017-03-03 | Senate | taken from Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | reassigned to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-03-02 | Senate | taken from Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 90-1 with Committee Substitute |
2017-02-27 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2017-02-24 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 27, 2017 |
2017-02-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2017-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-07 | House | to Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H) |
2017-01-07 | House | introduced in House |