KY HB153 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 175)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 175)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 189.222 to allow for a ten percent weight variance for vehicles transporting feed for livestock or poultry.
Title
AN ACT relating to overweight vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 470 (Y: 63 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 705 (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SFA 2 RSN# 419 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 419 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 37 (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 705 (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SFA 2 RSN# 419 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 419 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 37 (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 175) |
2018-04-13 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-04-13 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-04-13 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-04-13 | House | passed 63-26 |
2018-04-13 | House | Free Conference Committee report adopted in House |
2018-04-13 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Committee Report |
2018-04-13 | House | taken from Rules |
2018-04-13 | House | to Rules (H) |
2018-04-02 | House | received in House |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Bill passed 24-13 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate |
2018-04-02 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference for Monday, April 2, 2018 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report filed in Senate |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted in House and Senate |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed in House |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed in Senate |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from floor amendment (2) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | posted for passage for receding from Senate floor amendment (2) for Wednesday, February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-02-20 | House | House refused to concur in Senate floor amendment (2) |
2018-02-12 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendment (2) |
2018-02-08 | House | to Rules (H) |
2018-02-08 | House | received in House |
2018-02-07 | Senate | passed 32-5 with floor amendment (2) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2018-02-07 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2018-02-06 | Senate | floor amendment (2) filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2018-02-05 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 6, 2018 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2018-01-24 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-01-23 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-01-22 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-01-19 | House | 3rd reading, passed 84-1 |
2018-01-19 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2018-01-18 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, January 19, 2018 |
2018-01-18 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-01-17 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-01-10 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-10 | House | to Agriculture (H) |
2018-01-08 | House | introduced in House |