KY HB152 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 343.010 to modify the definitions of "apprentice," "apprenticeship agreement," and "council"; amend KRS 343.020 to include two public members on the Apprenticeship and Training Council; amend KRS 343.030 to eliminate the confirmation requirement for the Governor's appointment of a supervisor of apprenticeship and training; amend KRS 343.050 regarding the requirements for an apprenticeship agreement; amend the apprenticeship agreement approval requirements in KRS 343.060; amend KRS 343.070 to require an informal hearing before the supervisor for dispute resolution; amend KRS 343.080 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to apprenticeship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-19 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-13 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2013-02-11 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 13, 2012 |
2013-02-08 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-07 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-06 | House | posting waived |
2013-02-06 | House | to Labor & Industry (H) |
2013-02-05 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB152.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB152/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB152/vote_history.pdf |