KY HB151 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - returned to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 159.070 to permit a student to enroll in the school nearest to their home, except in cases in which there are academic or skill prerequisites for attendance in the school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to school attendance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-03Senatereturned to Education (S)
2017-03-03Senate2nd reading
2017-03-03Senatetaken from Education (S)
2017-03-02Senatereturned to Education (S)
2017-03-02Senate1st reading
2017-03-02Senatetaken from Education (S)
2017-02-27Senateto Education (S)
2017-02-24Senatereceived in Senate
2017-02-23House3rd reading, passed 59-37 with Committee Substitute(1) and floor amendment (1)
2017-02-22Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2017-02-21Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 23, 2017
2017-02-21House2nd reading, to Rules
2017-02-17Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2017-02-16Houseposted in committee
2017-02-16Houseposting waived
2017-02-07Houseto Education (H)
2017-01-06Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback