KY HB150 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of Subtitle 1 of KRS Chapter 304 to provide that a statement of law in the American Law Institute's Restatement of the Law, Liability Insurance does not constitute the law or public policy of the Commonwealth when in conflict with listed authority; amend KRS 304.1-120 to apply Section 1 of the Act to the listed organizations; provide short title; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the interpretation of laws and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 324 (Y: 66 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/ccr FINAL PASSAGE RSN# 1420 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1, sfa2 RSN# 1315 (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 104 (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-07HouseVetoed
2020-03-26Housedelivered to Governor
2020-03-26Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-03-26Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-03-26Housepassed 66-16
2020-03-26HouseConference Committee Report adopted in House
2020-03-26Houseposted for passage for consideration of Conference Committee Report
2020-03-26Houseto Rules (H)
2020-03-26Housereceived in House
2020-03-26Senatepassed 28-0
2020-03-26SenateConference Committee Report adopted in Senate
2020-03-26Senateposted for passage for consideration of Conference Committee Report
2020-03-26SenateConference Committee Report filed in House and Senate
2020-03-26SenateConference Committee appointed in House
2020-03-19SenateConference Committee appointed in Senate
2020-03-19SenateSenate refused to recede from Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (2)
2020-03-19Senateposted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (2)
2020-03-19Senateto Rules (S)
2020-03-19Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-18HouseHouse refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (2)
2020-03-17Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (2)
2020-03-12Houseto Rules (H)
2020-03-12Housereceived in House
2020-03-12Senatepassed 28-6 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (2)
2020-03-12Senatefloor amendment (1) withdrawn
2020-03-12Senate3rd reading
2020-03-11Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2020-03-10Senatefloor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-03-10Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2020
2020-03-06Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-05Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-03-05Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-02-18Senateto Judiciary (S)
2020-02-13Senatereceived in Senate
2020-02-12House3rd reading, passed 60-35 with Committee Substitute (1), floor amendment (1), and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-02-10Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-02-10Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 11, 2020
2020-02-06House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-05Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-01-10Houseposted in committee
2020-01-09Housereassigned to Judiciary (H)
2020-01-07Houseto Banking & Insurance (H)
2020-01-07Houseintroduced in House
2019-12-09HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback