KY HB150 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 16 to require the Department of Kentucky State Police to operate a Kentucky Golden Alert System to provide public notification through the use of the news media and highway signs when an impaired person, as defined in KRS 39F.010, is determined to be missing.
Title
AN ACT creating the Kentucky Golden Alert System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 102 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2019-02-20 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-19 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-07 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-05 | House | reassigned to Transportation (H) |
2019-01-11 | House | to State Government (H) |
2019-01-10 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Constables
Disabilities and the Disabled
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
Mental Disability
News Media
Notices
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, City and County
Police, State
Public Safety
Sheriffs
Transportation
Constables
Disabilities and the Disabled
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
Mental Disability
News Media
Notices
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, City and County
Police, State
Public Safety
Sheriffs
Transportation