KY HB149 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 97)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 97)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 324.085 to allow online hours as an acceptable form of continuing education; require licensees to complete 48 hours of classroom or online hours of commission-approved post-license education within 2 years of receiving or activating their licenses; explain the conditions that warrant a license being cancelled; require that postlicense instructors maintain a minimum rating as prescribed by the commission; amend KRS 324.010 to expand the definition of "cancelled to conform."
Title
AN ACT relating to the continuing education of real estate licensees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 97) |
2015-03-24 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-24 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-24 | House | received in House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2015 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-03-03 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (4) |
2015-02-25 | House | floor amendment (4) filed to Committee Substitute |
2015-02-24 | House | floor amendments (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute |
2015-02-23 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2015-02-12 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 13, 2015 |
2015-02-12 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 17, 2015 |
2015-02-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-04 | House | posted in committee |
2015-01-09 | House | to Licensing & Occupations (H) |
2015-01-08 | House | introduced in House |