KY HB149 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 134.127 to allow the county clerk to prepare an in-house document to release any notice filed pursuant to KRS 382.440 or 382.450 when a certificate of delinquency has been paid in full to the county clerk; amend KRS 134.128 to allow clerks with oil and gas certificates of delinquency to request a later sale date so that all certificates can be sold in one sale, and to provide that any certificates received after the sale shall be sold in the next annual sale; amend KRS 134.490 to require a second notice to be sent if the first notice is returned as undeliverable, and to change the process for obtaining updated information; amend KRS 134.504 to make a technical correction.
Title
AN ACT relating to delinquent property taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-02-16 | floor amendment (4) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-15 | floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-15 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 16, 2011 | |
2011-02-14 | floor amendment (2) withdrawn | |
2011-02-10 | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-09 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-08 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-04 | posted in committee | |
2011-01-05 | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-01-04 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB149.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB149/bill.doc |