KY HB148 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 47-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 152)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 311 to provide that if the United States Supreme Court reverses Roe v. Wade, or an amendment is adopted to the United State Constitution restoring state authority to prohibit abortion, no person shall knowingly administer to, prescribe for, procure for, or sell to any pregnant woman any medicine, drug, or other substance with the specific intent of causing or abetting the termination of the life of an unborn human being and no person shall use or employ any instrument or procedure upon a pregnant woman with the specific intent of causing or abetting the termination of the life of an unborn human being; any person who violates the prohibition is guilty of a Class D felony; provide an exemption for a licensed physician to perform a medical procedure necessary in reasonable medical judgment to prevent the death or substantial risk of death due to a physical condition, or to prevent the serious, permanent impairment of a life-sustaining organ of a pregnant woman; specify that this Act shall also be effective to the appropriation of Medicaid funds that set forth the limited circumstances in which states must fund abortion to remain eligible to receive federal Medicaid funds; repeal KRS 311.710; provide that this Act may be cited as the Human Life Protection Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to abortion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1010 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 44 (Y: 69 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 152)
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Housereceived in House
2019-03-14Senate3rd reading, passed 32-5
2019-03-14Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019
2019-03-12Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-07Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-20Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-02-15Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-15House3rd reading, passed 69-20 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-14Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2) filed
2019-02-14Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2019
2019-02-14House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-13Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-08Houseposted in committee
2019-01-11Houseto Judiciary (H)
2019-01-10Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback