KY HB147 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 153)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 159.832 to apply defined terms through KRS 158.838 and define "seizure action plan"; amend KRS 158.838 to include any medication prescribed to treat seizure disorder symptoms; require seizure disorder trainings to comply with Epilepsy Foundation of America guidelines; require parent or guardian of student diagnosed with a seizure disorder to collaborate with school personnel to create a seizure action plan; require the Kentucky Board of Education to promulgate administrative regulations regarding contents and development of seizure action plans; create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to require every public school to provide a seizure education program; require Kentucky Board of Education to promulgate administrative regulations for development and implementation of the seizure education program; amend KRS 158.070 to require a minimum of one hour of self-study review of seizure disorder materials annually for all principals, guidance counselors, and teachers; provide that the Act may be cited as the Lindsey Crunk Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to seizure disorders in schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 446 (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 651 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 235 (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 153)
2018-04-02Housedelivered to Governor
2018-04-02Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-04-02Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-04-02HouseBill passed 90-1
2018-04-02HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute
2018-04-02Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute
2018-04-02Housetaken from Rules (H)
2018-03-27Houseto Rules (H)
2018-03-27Housereceived in House
2018-03-27Senate3rd reading, passed 36-1 with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-03-27Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 27, 2018
2018-03-22Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill
2018-03-21Senatereturned to Education (S)
2018-03-21Senate2nd reading
2018-03-21Senatetaken from Education (S)
2018-03-20Senatereturned to Education (S)
2018-03-20Senate1st reading
2018-03-20Senatetaken from Education (S)
2018-03-09Senateto Education (S)
2018-03-08Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-07House3rd reading, passed 92-1 with floor amendments (1) and (3)
2018-03-06Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 7, 2018
2018-03-02Houseto Rules (H)
2018-03-02Housetaken from Education (H)
2018-02-22Housefloor amendment (3) filed
2018-01-25Housefloor amendment (2) filed
2018-01-25Houserecommitted to Education (H)
2018-01-24House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-01-23Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2018-01-23Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2018-01-18Houseposted in committee
2018-01-09Houseto Education (H)
2018-01-05Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback