KY HB147 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 164 to require students entering postsecondary education institutions to submit documentation of vaccination for diseases required by the Cabinet for Health and Family Services; provide for religious exemption; provide that the cabinet is not required to pay for the vaccinations.
Title
AN ACT relating to the vaccination of postsecondary students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2017-02-13 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 14, 2017 |
2017-02-10 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-09 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2017-02-09 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with committee amendment (1-title) and Committee Substitute |
2017-02-07 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-07 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2017-01-05 | House | introduced in House |