KY HB145 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-11 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-11 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 311.621 to define "medical order for scope of treatment"; create a new section of KRS 311.621 to 311.643 to permit the completion of a medical order for scope of treatment directing medical interventions; require the Kentucky Board of Medical Licensure to promulgate administrative regulations to develop a standardized medical order for scope of treatment form; list the required contents of the standardized medical order for scope of treatment; amend KRS 311.623, 311.633, and 311.637 to add the medical order for scope of treatment.
Title
AN ACT relating to a medical order for scope of treatment.
Sponsors
Rep. David Watkins [D] | Rep. Regina Huff [R] | Rep. Jim Gooch [R] | Rep. Derrick Graham [D] |
Rep. Martha King [D] | Rep. Michael Meredith [R] | Rep. Kevin Sinnette [D] | Rep. Susan Westrom [D] |
Rep. Brent Yonts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | passed 86-7 |
2014-03-06 | House | floor amendment (2) defeated |
2014-03-06 | House | 3rd reading |
2014-01-29 | House | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2014-01-28 | House | floor amendment (2) filed |
2014-01-24 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2014-01-24 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day for Monday, January 27, 2014 |
2014-01-24 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-01-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-01-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2014-01-21 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-08 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2014-01-07 | House | introduced in House |