KY HB142 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 131)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 131)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 157.410 to require the chief state school officer to prepare estimates for school district fund allotment and establish an incremental schedule for fund disbursement, allotment revisions, and equalization.
Title
AN ACT relating to the distribution of school funds.
Sponsors
Rep. John Carney [R] | Rep. Tim Couch [R] | Rep. Regina Huff [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 669 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 112 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 112 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 131) |
2018-03-29 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-29 | House | received in House |
2018-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 29, 2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-22 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-02-16 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-02-09 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-0 |
2018-02-08 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 9, 2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-02-01 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-08 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | introduced in House |