KY HB141 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 012)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 012)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 67.0802 to clarify that any proceeds from property disposed of by a county that was acquired through forfeiture or purchased using restricted funds under KRS 218A.420(4)(a) shall be transferred to a restricted account under KRS 218A.420.
Title
AN ACT relating to the sale or disposition of certain county property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 911 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 51 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 51 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 012) |
2019-03-05 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-05 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-05 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-04 | House | received in House |
2019-03-04 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-1 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-19 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2019-02-14 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-05 | House | posted in committee |
2019-01-11 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2019-01-10 | House | introduced in House |