KY HB141 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-02 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-02 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 160.599 to remove eligibility criteria for a loan from the emergency revolving school loan fund account; provide loan eligibility for a school district with a significant revenue shortfall due to circumstances beyond the district's control or other extraordinary financial circumstances; reduce the maximum loan term from 10 to 5 years; increase the maximum loan amount from $250,000 to $500,000; authorize the Kentucky Board of Education to promulgate administrative regulations regarding the loan process; direct the Kentucky Department of Education to monitor loans made from the emergency revolving school loan fund account and provide the Interim Joint Committee on Appropriations and Revenue a financial report by October 1 each year; amend KRS 157.330 to specify that any unexpended SEEK funds shall not lapse and shall be transferred to the emergency revolving school loan fund account; APPROPRIATION; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to the emergency revolving school loan fund account, making an appropriation therefore, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. John Carney [R] | Rep. John Blanton [R] | Rep. Tim Couch [R] | Rep. Chris Fugate [R] |
Rep. Regina Huff [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 107 (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Consider Motion HFA 2 RCS# 106 (Y: 18 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Consider Motion HFA 2 RCS# 106 (Y: 18 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2018-04-02 | Senate | 1st reading |
2018-04-02 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-02-09 | House | passed 85-2 with Committee Substitute |
2018-02-09 | House | floor amendment (2) defeated |
2018-02-09 | House | 3rd reading |
2018-02-08 | House | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) filed to the Bill |
2018-02-07 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 8, 2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2018-02-01 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-08 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | introduced in House |