KY HB14 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-4)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 27)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-4)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 27)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 532.031, relating to an offense committed as a result of a hate crime, to include offenses committed against an individual because of the individual's actual or perceived employment as a city, county, state, or federal peace officer, member of an organized fire department, emergency medical services personnel; provide that "emergency medical services personnel" is defined as in KRS 311A.010; enumerate that members of an organized fire department or emergency medical services personnel includes volunteer members if the violation occurs while the volunteer is performing duties with an organized fire department or emergency medical services personnel.
Title
AN ACT relating to hate crimes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 27) |
2017-03-08 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-08 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-07 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-07 | House | received in House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-5 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 7, 2017 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-01 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-27 | Senate | reassigned to State & Local Government (S) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-13 | House | passed 77-13-1 |
2017-02-13 | House | floor amendment (3) defeated |
2017-02-13 | House | floor amendment (1) ruled out of order |
2017-02-13 | House | 3rd reading |
2017-02-10 | House | floor amendment (3) filed |
2017-02-09 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 13, 2017 |
2017-02-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-08 | House | floor amendment (1) and (2-title) filed |
2017-02-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-07 | House | posted in committee |
2017-01-03 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2017-01-03 | House | introduced in House |
2016-07-06 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |