KY HB136 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 16)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 16)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 243.157 to require microbreweries to report and pay taxes on wholesale sales made directly to consumers to the Department of Revenue; amend KRS 243.882 to define "microbrewery" and to include retail sales made by a microbrewery directly to a consumer in the definition of "wholesale sale"; amend KRS 243.884 to include microbreweries selling malt beverages directly to consumers; amend KRS 243.886 to exempt microbreweries from the authorization to deduct one percent of the tax due; amend KRS 211.285 to include microbreweries.
Title
AN ACT relating to microbreweries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 484 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 105 (Y: 68 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 105 (Y: 68 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 16) |
2018-03-06 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-06 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-02 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-02 | House | received in House |
2018-03-01 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-3 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 1, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-02-15 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-02-09 | House | passed 68-15 with Committee Substitute and floor amendments (1) and (5) |
2018-02-09 | House | floor amendment (8) ruled out of order |
2018-02-09 | House | 3rd reading |
2018-02-08 | House | floor amendment (2) withdrawn |
2018-02-08 | House | floor amendments (7) and (8) filed to Committee Substitute |
2018-02-07 | House | floor amendments (5) and (6) filed to Committee Substitute |
2018-02-05 | House | floor amendment (4) filed to Committee Substitute |
2018-02-01 | House | floor amendment (1), (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute |
2018-02-01 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 2, 2018 |
2018-02-01 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-01-31 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2018-01-19 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-09 | House | reassigned to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2018-01-08 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | introduced in House |