KY HB135 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-04 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-04 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to establish the School and Student Safety Review Subcommittee as a statutory committee of the Legislative Research Commission; amends KRS 158.442 and KRS 158.444 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to school and student safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Henderson [D] | Rep. Keith Hall [D] | Rep. Leslie Combs [D] | Rep. Mitchel Denham [D] |
Rep. Thomas McKee [D] | Rep. John Stacy [D] | Rep. Gregory Stumbo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-04 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2013-02-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-1 |
2013-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 26, 2013 |
2013-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-13 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-05 | House | to Education (H) |
2013-01-11 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB135.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB135/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB135/vote_history.pdf |