KY HB130 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS 13A.290 to 13A.335 to require the staff of the Administrative Regulation Review Subcommittee to submit to that committee's co-chairs an annual report on administrative regulations found deficient by a legislative committee; list the information that is necessary to complete the report; include prominent text on the first page of the report outlining potential legislative options; amend KRS 13A.290, 13A.330, and 13A.331 to allow a committee to take action on an administrative regulation within 60 days of LRC referral.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to administrative regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 770 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 54 (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26Housevetoed
2018-04-14Housedelivered to Governor
2018-04-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-04-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-04-14Housereceived in House
2018-04-14Senate3rd reading, passed 38-0
2018-04-14Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Saturday, April 14, 2018
2018-04-14Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
2018-04-14Senatereassigned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2018-03-29Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2018-03-29Senate2nd reading
2018-03-29Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2018-03-27Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2018-03-27Senate1st reading
2018-03-27Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2018-01-29Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2018-01-26Senatereceived in Senate
2018-01-25House3rd reading, passed 91-1 with Committee Substitute
2018-01-24Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 25, 2018
2018-01-19House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-01-18Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-01-09Houseposted in committee
2018-01-08Houseto State Government (H)
2018-01-04Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback