KY HB13 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 141.020 to increase the tax rate on income over $75,000; amend KRS 141.066 to establish a refundable earned income tax credit at 15 percent of the federal credit; amend KRS 140.130 to decouple from the federal estate tax phase-out; amend KRS 139.010, 139.200, and 139.480 to make selected services subject to sales tax; amend KRS 141.0205 to recognize changes to income tax credits; make income tax provisions apply to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2010, make estate tax provisions effective for deaths on or after August 1, 2010; make sales tax provisions effective July 1, 2010.
Title
AN ACT relating to taxation and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Cherry [D] | Rep. Derrick Graham [D] | Rep. Joni Jenkins [D] | Rep. Mary Marzian [D] |
Rep. Reginald Meeks [D] | Rep. Darryl Owens [D] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] | Rep. Jim Wayne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2010-01-05 | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in House | |
2010-09-02 | To: Interim Joint Committee on Appropriations and Revenue |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB13.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB13/bill.doc |