KY HB129 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - returned to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 199 to establish the child abuse or neglect perpetrator registry (CANPR); establish definitions and establish requirements for operation of the CANPR; cite this Act as the Kylie Jo Sizemore Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to child abuse or neglect.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-07Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2017-03-07Senate2nd reading
2017-03-07Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2017-03-06Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2017-03-06Senate1st reading
2017-03-06Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2017-03-02Senateto Judiciary (S)
2017-03-02Senatereceived in Senate
2017-03-01House3rd reading, passed 84-0 with Committee Substitute, floor amendments (1) and (2-title)
2017-02-23Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2-title) filed
2017-02-23Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 24, 2017
2017-02-23House2nd reading, to Rules
2017-02-22Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with committee amendment (1-title) and Committee Substitute
2017-02-21Houseposted in committee
2017-02-07Houseto Judiciary (H)
2017-01-04Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback