KY HB128 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 187)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 156 to require the Kentucky Board of Education to promulgate administrative regulations to establish an elective social studies course on the Hebrew Scriptures, Old Testament of the Bible, the New Testament, or a combination of the Hebrew Scriptures and the New Testament of the Bible; require that the course provide to students knowledge of biblical content, characters, poetry, and narratives that are prerequisites to understanding contemporary society and culture, including literature, art, music, mores, oratory, and public policy; permit students to use various translations of the Bible for the course; amend KRS 158.197 to permit a school council to offer an elective social studies course on the Hebrew Scriptures, Old Testament of the Bible, the New Testament, or a combination of the Hebrew Scriptures and the New Testament of the Bible.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to Bible literacy courses in the public schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-11Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 187)
2017-03-30Housedelivered to Governor
2017-03-30Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2017-03-30Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2017-03-30Housereceived in House
2017-03-29Senate3rd reading, passed 34-4
2017-03-29Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 29, 2017
2017-03-14Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
2017-03-08Senatereturned to Education (S)
2017-03-08Senate1st reading
2017-03-08Senatetaken from Education (S)
2017-02-27Senateto Education (S)
2017-02-24Senatereceived in Senate
2017-02-23House3rd reading, passed 80-14
2017-02-23Housefloor amendment (1) defeated
2017-02-23House3rd reading
2017-02-22Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 23, 2017
2017-02-22House2nd reading, to Rules
2017-02-21Housefloor amendment (1) and (2) filed
2017-02-21Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2017-02-17Houseposted in committee
2017-02-07Houseto Education (H)
2017-01-04Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback