KY HB122 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 24 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Enrolled on February 24 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 154.12-203 to include the Chief Justice in membership of the Kentucky Commission on Military Affairs.
Title
AN ACT relating to membership of the Kentucky Commission on Military Affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | signed by Governor | |
2011-02-28 | delivered to Governor | |
2011-02-28 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2011-02-24 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2011-02-24 | received in House | |
2011-02-23 | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 | |
2011-02-23 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 23, 2011 | |
2011-02-18 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-17 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-11 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) | |
2011-02-09 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-08 | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 | |
2011-02-03 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 8, 2011 | |
2011-02-03 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-02 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-01-07 | posted in committee | |
2011-01-04 | to Military Affairs & Public Safety (H) | |
2011-01-04 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB122.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB122/bill.doc |