KY HB121 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 218A to ban possession, trafficking, or manufacture of 3,4-methylenedioxypyrovalerone the primary ingredient of a drug with a street name "dove"; amend various sections of KRS Chapters 217 and 218A and KRS 530.064 relating to unlawful transaction with a minor to conform; EMERGENCY

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to crimes and punishments and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-16 signed by Governor
2011-03-04 delivered to Governor
2011-03-04 enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
2011-03-04 passed 95-0
2011-03-04 House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute
2011-03-04 posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute
2011-03-04 received in House
2011-03-04 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute
2011-03-03 posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 4, 2011
2011-03-03 reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a Consent Bill
2011-02-28 returned to Judiciary (S)
2011-02-28 2nd reading
2011-02-28 taken from Judiciary (S)
2011-02-25 returned to Judiciary (S)
2011-02-25 1st reading
2011-02-25 taken from Judiciary (S)
2011-02-09 to Judiciary (S)
2011-02-07 received in Senate
2011-02-04 3rd reading, passed 94-0 with Committee Substitute
2011-02-03 posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 4, 2011
2011-02-03 2nd reading, to Rules
2011-02-02 reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2011-02-01 posting waived
2011-01-04 to Judiciary (H)
2011-01-04 introduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback