KY HB117 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - posted in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - posted in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 161.740 to ensure that a teacher who has attained continuing contract status in one school district maintains that status in subsequent districts of employment.
Title
AN ACT relating to teacher tenure.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Stewart [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-08 | House | posted in committee |
2013-01-11 | House | to Education (H) |
2013-01-10 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB117.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB117/bill.doc |