KY HB115 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 68)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 68)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 40.010 to redefine the period of the "Korean conflict" to match the federal designation of June 27, 1950, to January 31, 1955.
Title
AN ACT relating to the dates of the Korean conflict.
Sponsors
Rep. Tanya Pullin [D] | Rep. Mitchel Denham [D] | Rep. Jeff Greer [D] | Rep. Charles Miller [D] |
Rep. Fitz Steele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 68) |
2015-03-24 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-24 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-24 | House | received in House |
2015-03-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-19 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2015-02-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-13 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 |
2015-02-12 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 13, 2015 |
2015-02-12 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 17, 2015 |
2015-02-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-09 | House | posted in committee |
2015-01-08 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) |
2015-01-06 | House | introduced in House |