KY HB115 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-10 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-10 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 403.200, relating to temporary orders, to permit a court to provide for wage assignment and automatic electronic transfer of funds for payment of spousal maintenance; amend KRS 403.270, relating to custodial issues, to add the promotion of a healthy relationship between the child and other custodian or parent as a factor for the consideration of awarding custody of children; amend KRS 530.050, relating to nonsupport and flagrant nonsupport, to add spouse and former spouse; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to domestic relations and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Crimm [R] | Rep. Joni Jenkins [D] | Rep. Charles Miller [D] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2010-02-08 | received in Senate | |
2010-02-05 | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title), floor amendment (1) | |
2010-02-03 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2010-02-02 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 3, 2010 | |
2010-01-28 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-01-27 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2010-01-26 | posting waived | |
2010-01-05 | to Judiciary (H) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in House | |
2010-09-02 | To: Interim Joint Committee on Judiciary |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB115.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB115/bill.doc |