KY HB110 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 098)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 098)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 367.97524 to permit a funeral director who has been in possession of unclaimed cremated remains for two years or more to inter, bury, entomb, or place the cremated remains in a columbarium or to deliver the cremated remains to a bona fide religious society, veterans organization, or civil group for interment, burial, entombment, or placement in a columbarium; exempt a crematory authority or licensed funeral directory from liability for delivering cremated remains that have been in their possession for two years or more to a bona fide religious society, veterans organization, or civil group for the sole purpose of interment, burial, entombment, or placement in a columbarium.
Title
AN ACT relating to the disposition of human remains.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1017 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 47 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 47 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 098) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | received in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-12 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-07 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-05 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-19 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2019-02-14 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-07 | House | posted in committee |
2019-01-10 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H) |
2019-01-08 | House | introduced in House |