KY HB11 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - signed by Governor (KY Acts Ch. 198)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 438 to define terms; prohibit use of tobacco products by students, school personnel, and visitors in schools, school vehicles, properties, and activities; require policies to be in place by the 2020-2021 school year; require that smoke-free policies and signage be adopted; provide that existing bans are not impacted; repeal KRS 438.050.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to student health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1121 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 282 (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: Adopt HFA 4 RCS# 281 (Y: 22 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts Ch. 198)
2019-03-28Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-28Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-28Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-28Housereceived in House
2019-03-28Senate3rd reading, passed 28-10
2019-03-28Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2019
2019-03-14Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-13Senatereturned to Health & Welfare (S)
2019-03-13Senate1st reading
2019-03-13Senatetaken from Health & Welfare (S)
2019-03-13Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2019-03-13Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-12Housepassed 85-11 with floor amendments (2) and (5)
2019-03-12Housefloor amendment (4) defeated
2019-03-12House3rd reading
2019-03-12Housefloor amendment (8) filed
2019-03-06Housefloor amendments (6) and (7-title) filed
2019-03-04Housefloor amendment (5) filed
2019-02-22Housefloor amendment (4) filed
2019-02-21Housefloor amendment (3) filed
2019-02-15Housefloor amendment (2) filed
2019-02-13Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2019-02-11Housetaken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
2019-02-08Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 11, 2019
2019-02-08House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-07Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-02-05Houseposted in committee
2019-01-10Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2019-01-08Houseintroduced in House
2018-12-14HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback